McCloud v. Save-a-lot Knoxville, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Larry McCloud
Defendant: Save-a-lot, LTD., Newcorp, LLC, Moran Foods, LLC, Save-a-lot Knoxville, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2018cv00486
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 12/10/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (copy mailed to Brian Herrington) (AGA) Modified text on 12/10/2018 (JBR).
December 6, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Larry McCloud (JBR)
December 6, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee received re #8 . $90.00, receipt number K3036933 (JBR)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 11/30/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Chant Yedalian on 12/3/2018 (JBR).
November 30, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3828363.) filed by Larry McCloud (JBR)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3828363.) by Larry McCloud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing)(Barrett, Patrick)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) re: #8 MOTION for Brian Herrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice : The $90.00 filing fee must be paid. (copy mailed to attorney Herrington) (AYB)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Brian Herrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Larry McCloud. (Filing fee not received.) (AYB)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 11/16/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Brian K Herrington and Chant Yedalian)(JCK)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 11/16/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Brian K Herrington and Chant Yedalian)(JCK)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 11/16/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Brian K Herrington and Chant Yedalian)(JCK)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorneys Chant Yedalian and Brian K. Herrington are not admitted. This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Chant Yedalian, Brian K. Herrington) (JCK)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel, Informational only. For future reference, the summons and civil cover sheet should not be filed in a fillable format. (JCK)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Moran Foods, LLC, Newcorp, LLC, Save-a-lot Knoxville, LLC, Save-a-lot, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Newcorp, LLC, #2 Summons Moran Foods, LLC, #3 Summons Save-a-lot, LTD.)(JCK)
November 16, 2018 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JCK)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3818691.), filed by Larry McCloud. (Attachments: #1 Other civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Save-a-lot Knoxville, #3 Summons Newcorp, #4 Summons Moran Foods, #5 Summons Save-a-lot LTD, #6 Exhibit Article - Six Seconds to Hack, #7 Exhibit Article - Online Card Payment Landscape, #8 Exhibit US Brief)(Barrett, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCloud v. Save-a-lot Knoxville, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save-a-lot, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newcorp, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moran Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save-a-lot Knoxville, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry McCloud
Represented By: Patrick M Barrett, III
Represented By: Chant Yedalian
Represented By: Brian K Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?