Thomas v. Capital Resorts Group, LLC (PLR2)

Plaintiff: Stacy Thomas
Defendant: Capital Resorts Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00494
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Capital Resorts Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Capital Vacations, LLC f/k/a National Hospitality Group, LLC for Capital Resorts Group, LLC. (Van Tol, Shannan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Agreed Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond by Capital Resorts Group, LLC. (Van Tol, Shannan)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 12/20/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Jarrett Ellzey and Craft Hughes on 12/21/2018 (JBR).
December 20, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William Craft Hughes ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3843199.) filed by Stacy Thomas, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jarrett Ellzey ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3843207.) filed by Stacy Thomas (JBR)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jarrett Ellzey ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3843207.) by Stacy Thomas. (Griffin, John)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William Craft Hughes ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3843199.) by Stacy Thomas. (Griffin, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) mailed to Attorneys Jarrett Ellzey and W. Craft Hughes. (AML, )
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/21/2018. (AML, )
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/21/2018. (AML, )
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/21/2018. (AML, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capital Resorts Group, LLC. (AML, )
November 21, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AML, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital Resorts Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3824006.), filed by Stacy Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Capital Resorts Group, LLC (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Thomas
Represented By: Jarrett L. Ellzey
Represented By: John J Griffin, Jr
Represented By: W. Craft Hughes
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Resorts Group, LLC
Represented By: Shannan F Van Tol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?