Summit Properties Partnership v. Advance Stores Company, Incorporated (TV3)

Plaintiff: Summit Properties Partnership
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2018cv00497
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Summit Properties Partnership (Howell, Dean) (Main Document 23 replaced on 1/22/2019 with flattened .pdf) (AYB).
January 18, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean)
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Draper, David)
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean)
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean)
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand (Reply Memorandum) filed by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean)
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Renewed) by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Draper, David)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 Amended ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against Summit Properties Partnership by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Draper, David)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collective A amended notice of removal) (Cody, Brady) Modified text on 12/10/2018 (AYB).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on December 6, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AYB)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Vacate)(Draper, David)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Summit Properties Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- November 19, 2018 email from Advance Stores' counsel with attachments, #2 Exhibit 2- November 20, 2018 email from Advance Stores' counsel, #3 Exhibit 3- November 26, 2018 email from Advance Stores' counsel with attachment, #4 Exhibit 4- Affidavit of Tom Wortham)(Howell, Dean)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Advance Auto Parts, Inc for Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Draper, David)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/27/2018. (AMP)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/27/2018. (AMP)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/27/2018. (AMP)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Administrative Notice to Counsel #3 Notice (Other) : Wrong event used. Please file using the event Certificate of Corporate Interest under Other Documents. Requirements due by 12/3/2018. (AMP)
November 27, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated of Filing of Removal to Plaintiff's Attorney (Draper, David)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, Disclosure Statement (Draper, David)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Draper, David)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County General Sessions Court Div. II, case number 18CW0961. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3825976), filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state pleadings)(Draper, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Properties Partnership v. Advance Stores Company, Incorporated (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Properties Partnership
Represented By: Dean Thomas Howell
Represented By: Charles Gavin Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Represented By: David A Draper
Represented By: Brady C Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?