Lakins v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Laura Lakins
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00514
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Laura Lakins (Philipps, David)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff requests a stay of the action pending her filing for dismissal by February 8, 2019. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's request. Plaintiff SHALL file for dismissal on or before February 8, 2019 or show cause why she has not done so. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/11/2018. (BJL, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Laura Lakins Case Reported Settled By Plaintiff; Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Philipps, David)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/6/2018. (DJH, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/6/2018. (DJH, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/6/2018. (DJH, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (DJH, )
December 5, 2018 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (DJH, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Elizabeth Ellis Banks on behalf of Laura Lakins (Banks, Heather)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia T Lawson on behalf of Laura Lakins (Lawson, Cynthia)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E Philipps on behalf of Laura Lakins (Philipps, Mary)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3832630.), filed by Laura Lakins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Other Disclosure Statement, #11 Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lakins v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Lakins
Represented By: Mary E Philipps
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Ellis Banks
Represented By: Cynthia T Lawson
Represented By: David J Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?