Watson et al v. Eaton et al (JRG1)

Plaintiff: Shalanna Watson
Defendant: Darrell G Eaton
Case Number: 3:2018cv00520
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wisdom Wheeler and John H. Templeton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wheeler, Robert) Modified text on 2/6/2019 (ABF).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on a sua sponte review of the record. The parties SHALL redact the minor plaintiffs' names from all future filings with the Court. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 01/15/2019. (AMP)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs' counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 01/15/2019. (AMP)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Darrell G Eaton, Darrell G Eaton (Stackhouse, Mary)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Darrell G Eaton, Darrell G Eaton.(Stackhouse, Mary)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION by Darrell G Eaton. (Stackhouse, Mary)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/12/18. (ABF)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/12/18. (ABF)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/12/18. (ABF)
December 12, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Darrell G Eaton, Individually and d/b/a Joe's Trucking. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stackhouse, Mary) Modified filer on 12/12/2018 (ABF).
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County Circuit, case number V18288S. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3837826), filed by d/b/a Joe's Trucking, Darrell G Eaton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stackhouse, Mary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2018: #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet) (JAN, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson et al v. Eaton et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell G Eaton
Represented By: Mary Ann Stackhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalanna Watson
Represented By: Michael A Anderson
Represented By: John Harvey Templeton
Represented By: Robert Wisdom Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?