Bobek v. Clamore, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: William Bobek
Defendant: Clamore, LLC, aka Clamore Restaurants, LLC, IHOP Leasing LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC, Clamore II, LLC, Clamore, LLC and Clamore Restaurants
Case Number: 3:2018cv00525
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Warchol, Samantha)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2019, at 01:30 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 1/10/2019. (CMH)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Clamore II, LLC, Clamore, LLC. (Lewis, Andrew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Jordan Lewis on behalf of Clamore II, LLC, Clamore, LLC (Lewis, Andrew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Clamore II, LLC, Clamore, LLC.(Lewis, Andrew)
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Bobek. International House of Pancakes, LLC served on 12/18/2018. (Ritchie, Wayne)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Bobek. IHOP Leasing LLC served on 12/18/2018. (Ritchie, Wayne)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Bobek. Clamore, LLC served on 12/22/2018. (Ritchie, Wayne)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Bobek. Clamore II, LLC served on 12/22/2018. (Ritchie, Wayne)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs claims against Defendants IHOP Leasing, LLC, and International House of Pancakes, LLC, are herebyDISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/21/2018. (BDG, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF WILLIAM BOBEK'S MOTION FOR THE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS IHOP LEASING, LLC AND INTERNATIONAL HOUSE OF PANCAKES, LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE by William Bobek. (Ritchie, Wayne)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/14/18. (aws, ) Mailed to Samantha Irina Warchol.
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/14/18. (aws, ) Mailed to Samantha Irina Warchol.
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/14/18. (aws, ) Mailed to Samantha Irina Warchol.
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 INFORMATIONAL Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Wayne A Ritchie, II & Samantha Irina Warchol re #1 Complaint. (aws, ) Mailed to Samantha Irina Warchol.
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Samantha Irina Warchol re #1 Complaint: requirements due by 12/19/2018. (aws, ) Mailed to Samantha Irina Warchol.
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Clamore II, LLC, #2 Summons IHOP, #3 Summons International House of Pancakes)(aws, )
December 14, 2018 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (aws, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3838615.), filed by William Bobek. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be issued to Clamore, LLC a/k/a Clamore Restaurants, LLC, #3 Summons to be issued to Clamore II, LLC, #4 Summons to be issued to IHOP Leasing LLC, #5 Summons to be issued to International House of Pancakes, LLC)(Ritchie, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobek v. Clamore, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clamore, LLC, aka Clamore Restaurants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHOP Leasing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International House of Pancakes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clamore II, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Jordan Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clamore, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Jordan Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clamore Restaurants
Represented By: Andrew Jordan Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bobek
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: Samantha Irina Warchol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?