Waters v. Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. (JRG1)

Plaintiff: Natosha Waters
Defendant: Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00529
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Natosha Waters (Philipps, David)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natosha Waters. Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. served on 1/3/2019. (Philipps, David)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/18/2018. (CAT)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/18/2018. (CAT)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/18/2018. (CAT)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Administrative Notice to Counsel #2 Notice of Appearance : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, please file the Notice of Appearance in a non-fillable format. (CAT)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, please file the Corporate Disclosure Statement using the event Certificate of Corporate Interest found under the category Other Documents. (CAT)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint: INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, please file the Civil Cover sheet and Summons in a non-fillable format. (CAT)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. (CAT)
December 18, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Elizabeth Ellis Banks on behalf of Natosha Waters (Banks, Heather)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia T Lawson on behalf of Natosha Waters (Lawson, Cynthia)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E Philipps on behalf of Natosha Waters (Philipps, Mary)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3841956.), filed by Natosha Waters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Other Disclosure Statement, #8 Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natosha Waters
Represented By: Mary E Philipps
Represented By: David J Philipps
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Ellis Banks
Represented By: Cynthia T Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?