Monday v. CSX Transportation, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ted Monday
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00533
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 1/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Baker, John)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Agreed Motion for Extension. Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint or or before February 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 1/11/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, John)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Baker, Jr on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Baker, John)
December 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ted Monday. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 12/21/2018. (Lampros, Andrew)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/21/2018. (BJL, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/21/2018. (BJL, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/21/2018. (BJL, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (BJL, )
December 20, 2018 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (BJL, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3844466.), filed by Ted Monday. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to CSX Transportation, Inc., #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Lampros, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monday v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Monday
Represented By: Andrew Lampros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Emily L Herman-Thompson
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?