Amble et al v. Spangler et al

Plaintiff: curtis lane, alonzo hoskins, robert thomas, floyd coulson, rick sayles, jessica mase, matthew walls, Michael Rice, John Hicks, Jessica Morgan, michael amble and david johnson
Defendant: Tom Spangler, Knox County, TN, Bernie Lyon and Knox County, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2018cv00538
Filed: December 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Wigler on behalf of Knox County, Tennessee, Bernie Lyon(Chief Deputy of Knox County Sheriff's Department in his official capacity), Tom Spangler(Sheriff of Knox County, Tennessee, in his official capacity) (Wigler, David)
January 15, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Knox County, Tennessee. (Wigler, David)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tom Spangler(in his individual capacity). (Wigler, David)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bernie Lyon(in his individual capacity). (Wigler, David)
January 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Thomas, Jessica Mase, Floyd Coulson, Michael Amble, Curtis Lane, John Hicks, Michael Rice, Matthew Walls, Jessica Morgan, Alonzo Hoskins, Rick Sayles, David Johnson. Bernie Lyon(in his individual capacity) served on 1/7/2019; Bernie Lyon(Chief Deputy of Knox County Sheriff's Department in his official capacity) served on 1/7/2019. (Eldridge, John)
January 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Thomas, Jessica Mase, Floyd Coulson, Michael Amble, Curtis Lane, John Hicks, Michael Rice, Matthew Walls, Jessica Morgan, Alonzo Hoskins, Rick Sayles, David Johnson. Knox County, Tennessee served on 12/31/2018. (Eldridge, John)
January 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Thomas, Jessica Mase, Floyd Coulson, Michael Amble, Curtis Lane, John Hicks, Michael Rice, Matthew Walls, Jessica Morgan, Alonzo Hoskins, Rick Sayles, David Johnson. Tom Spangler(Sheriff of Knox County, Tennessee, in his official capacity) served on 1/7/2019; Tom Spangler(in his individual capacity) served on 1/7/2019. (Eldridge, John)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/26/2018. (AMP)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/26/2018. (AMP)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/26/2018. (AMP)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Knox County, Tennessee, #2 Summons Tom Spangler) (AMP)
December 26, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
December 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion by John Hicks, Jessica Morgan, Michael Rice, michael amble, floyd coulson, alonzo hoskins, david johnson, curtis lane, jessica mase, rick sayles, robert thomas, matthew walls. (Eldridge, John)
December 24, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #2 MOTION to Certify Class filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eldridge, John)
December 23, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #2 MOTION to Certify Class filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eldridge, John)
December 23, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Certify Class by John Hicks, Jessica Morgan, Michael Rice, michael amble, floyd coulson, alonzo hoskins, david johnson, curtis lane, jessica mase, rick sayles, robert thomas, matthew walls. (Eldridge, John)
December 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT -Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3846800.), filed by michael amble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Knox County, TN, #5 Summons Bernie Lyon, #6 Summons Tom Spangler)(Eldridge, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amble et al v. Spangler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: curtis lane
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: alonzo hoskins
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: robert thomas
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: floyd coulson
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: rick sayles
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: jessica mase
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: matthew walls
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rice
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hicks
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Morgan
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: michael amble
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: david johnson
Represented By: John E Eldridge
Represented By: Francis L Lloyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Spangler
Represented By: David S Wigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County, TN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernie Lyon
Represented By: David S Wigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County, Tennessee
Represented By: David S Wigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?