White v. Lincoln Memorial University et al

Plaintiff: Ashley Elizabeth White
Defendant: Allison Greenstein Yow and Lincoln Memorial University
Case Number: 3:2019cv00008
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER, re expert depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/28/19. (KFB, )
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Dispositive Motions due by 7/20/2020.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/28/19. (KFB, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Allison Greenstein Yow of Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Rice, John)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Collver, Meagan)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER regarding Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2019 at 02:30 PM in Conference Room before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/22/2019. (TRT, )
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/7/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lincoln Memorial University. (Barcus, Heidi)
February 6, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln Memorial University.(Barcus, Heidi)
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Allison Greenstein Yow.(Caffey, Wynne)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 2/1/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2019, at 02:30 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 1/29/2019. (CEA)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi A Barcus on behalf of Lincoln Memorial University (Barcus, Heidi)
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Wynne DuMariau Caffey on behalf of Allison Greenstein Yow (Caffey, Wynne)
January 24, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Patrick Shea Callahan Esq filed by Ashley Elizabeth White, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amelia Phillips Esq filed by Ashley Elizabeth White . Attorney Admissions applications w/ associated fee received on 1/24/2019. No filing fee is required regarding the PHV motions due to receipt of attorney admissions paperwork. (KMK, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Patrick Shea Callahan Esq. : Filing fee not submitted. A copy of this notice of deficiency has been sent via U.S. Mail to Patrick Shea Callahan. (MDG)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amelia Phillips Esq. : Filing fee not submitted. (MDG) Filing fee not submitted. A copy of this notice of deficiency has been sent via U.S. Mail to Amelia Phillips.
January 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Patrick Shea Callahan Esq. by Ashley Elizabeth White. (Binkley, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amelia Phillips Esq. by Ashley Elizabeth White. (Binkley, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Elizabeth White. Lincoln Memorial University served on 1/16/2019. (Binkley, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Elizabeth White. Allison Greenstein Yow served on 1/16/2019. (Binkley, Andrew)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 01/07/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Patrick Callahan and Amelia Phillips) (CAT)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 01/07/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Patrick Callahan and Amelia Phillips) (CAT)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 01/07/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Patrick Callahan and Amelia Phillips) (CAT)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference please file summons in a non-fillable format. (CAT)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorney Patrick Callahan and Amelia Phillips are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Patrick Callahan and Amelia Phillips) (CAT)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Memorial University, Allison Greenstein Yow. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lincoln Memorial University) (CAT)
January 7, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CAT)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3853313.), filed by Ashley Elizabeth White. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Compliance, #2 Other Certificate of Good Faith, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Binkley, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Lincoln Memorial University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Greenstein Yow
Represented By: Wynne DuMariau Caffey
Represented By: John Towers Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Memorial University
Represented By: Meagan Davis Collver
Represented By: Heidi A Barcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Elizabeth White
Represented By: Andrew R Binkley
Represented By: Amelia A Phillips
Represented By: Patrick Shea Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?