Foster v. Hafner et al (PLR2)

Plaintiff: Marilyn R Foster
Defendant: Dr. Jonathan William Hafner and East Tennesse Ear, Nose & Throat Specialties, P.C.
Interested Party: Attorney General Herbert H. Slatery
Case Number: 3:2019cv00024
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
0 Judge: H Bruce Guyton
1 Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Marilyn R Foster (Jones, Jon)
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carter, Justin)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/18/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/13/19. (JBR, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Corporate Interest by East Tennesse Ear, Nose & Throat Specialties, P.C.. (Carter, Justin)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/7/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR, )
February 7, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by East Tennesse Ear, Nose & Throat Specialties, P.C.. (JBR, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by East Tennesse Ear, Nose & Throat Specialties, P.C., Jonathan William Hafner.(Carter, Justin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn R Foster. Herbert H. Slatery served on 1/18/2019. (Jones, Jon)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn R Foster. All Defendants. (Jones, Jon)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed 1/16/2019 Acknowledgement filed by Marilyn R Foster. (Jones, Jon)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Clarence J Gideon, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Gideon, Clarence)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #11 Notice of Appearance (Corrected Certificate of Service) by Justin Blake Carter on behalf of All Defendants (Carter, Justin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Blake Carter on behalf of All Defendants (Carter, Justin)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Office of the Attorney General. (JBR)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Marilyn R Foster. Amendment to #1 Complaint, summons (to be reissued). (Attachments: #1 Summons to be reissued)(Jones, Jon)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Marilyn R Foster. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Jon)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 1/15/2019. (BDG, )
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 1/15/2019. (BDG, )
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 1/15/2019. (BDG, )
January 15, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (BDG, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint, :Cover sheet not included requirements due by 1/22/2019. (BDG, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to East Tennesse Ear, Nose & Throat Specialties, P.C., Jonathan William Hafner. [Summons Issued to TN Atty. General will not be served and will be re-filed correctly and re-issued] (BDG, ) Modified text on 1/15/2019 (JBR).
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, by Marilyn R Foster. (Attachments: #1 Summons Dr. Jonathan Hafner, #2 Summons East Tennessee Ear,, #3 Summons TN Atty. General)(Jones, Jon)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3863214.), filed by Marilyn R Foster. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Compliance with T.C.A. Sec. 29-26-121(a)(3)(B), #2 Other Certificate of Good Faith)(Jones, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Hafner et al (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jonathan William Hafner
Represented By: Justin Blake Carter
Represented By: Clarence J Gideon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Tennesse Ear, Nose & Throat Specialties, P.C.
Represented By: Justin Blake Carter
Represented By: Clarence J Gideon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn R Foster
Represented By: Jon E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Attorney General Herbert H. Slatery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?