Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina v. Shubert et al

Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Defendant: Michael Shubert and Mark Shubert
Case Number: 3:2019cv00033
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Harry S Mattice
1 Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. Michael Shubert served on 3/2/2019. (Ashworth, Gail)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. Mark Shubert served on 2/22/2019. (Ashworth, Gail)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 2/6/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
February 5, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3882280.) filed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina (ABF)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3882280.) by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Ashworth, Gail)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Ashworth, Gail)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Ashworth, Gail)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Mark Shubert, Michael Shubert. (GRE, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Thomas J. Underwood. (GRE, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/22/19. (GRE, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/22/19. (GRE, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/22/19. (GRE, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : requirements due by 1/28/2019. (GRE, )
January 22, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (GRE, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Shubert, Michael Shubert ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3870478.), filed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Ashworth, Gail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina v. Shubert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Represented By: Thomas J. Underwood, Jr.
Represented By: Gail Vaughn Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Shubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?