Roach v. Midland Funding, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Cedric Roach
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00034
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Cedric Roach (Snyder, Brent)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER The Scheduling Conference originally set for 3/26/2019 is RESET for 4/23/2019, at 03:00 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 3/13/2019. (CMH)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants have until March 22, 2019 to file response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 03/07/2019. This entry constitutes the complete order of the court, and no document is attached hereto. (HSN)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Springfield, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2019, at 02:30 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 2/15/2019. (CMH)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #8 Stipulation Amended (Joint) by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Springfield, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Administrative Notice to Parris M. Bell re: #8 Stipulation: Attorney Parris M. Bell is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. Requirements due by 2/20/2019. (JBR, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 [DOCUMENT RE-FILED AS DOC. #10 DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR] STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, (Joint) by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Springfield, Robert) Modified text on 3/1/2019 (JBR, ).
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedric Roach. Midland Funding, LLC served on 1/25/2019. (Snyder, Brent)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedric Roach. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 1/25/2019. (Snyder, Brent)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/23/2019. (BDG, )
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/23/2019. (BDG, )
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/23/2019. (BDG, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (BDG, )
January 23, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (BDG, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3870807.), filed by Cedric Roach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit civil suit, #2 Exhibit sworn denial, #3 Exhibit non-suit, #4 Other cover sheet, #5 Summons Midland, #6 Summons MCM)(Snyder, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roach v. Midland Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Robert Franklin Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Franklin Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Roach
Represented By: Brent S Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?