Holland et al v. Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Jerry Holland and Kathryn Holland
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Mylan Laboratories, Ltd., Actavis LLC, Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Mylan, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. and Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00040
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Case transferred from Tennessee Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 1:19-cv-07154, filed 02/27/2019.(KMK, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 MDL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to New Jersey (ABF)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 2/14/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 2/19/2019 (KMK): Copy mailed to George Williamson
February 6, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3884673.) filed by Kathryn Holland, Jerry Holland (ABF)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3884673.) by Jerry Holland, Kathryn Holland. (McKellar, Andrea)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Mylan Laboratories, Ltd., Mylan, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc, #2 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd, #3 Summons Mylan Laboratories, Ltd, #4 Summons Mylan Inc, #5 Summons Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc, #6 Summons Aurobindo Pharma Limited, #7 Summons Actavis Pharma Inc., #8 Summons Actavis, LLC)(ABF)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Jerry Holland, Kathryn Holland. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(McKellar, Andrea)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/25/19. (ABF)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/25/19. (ABF)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/25/19. (ABF)
January 25, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants.. (ABF)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to George T. Williamson: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (c/m to George T. Williamson, Farr, Farr, Emerich, Hackett, Carr & Holmes, PA, 99 Nesbit Street, Punta Gorda, FL 33950) (ABF)
January 24, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3873442.), filed by Kathryn Holland, Jerry Holland.(McKellar, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland et al v. Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Holland
Represented By: Andrea T McKellar
Represented By: George T Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Holland
Represented By: Andrea T McKellar
Represented By: George T Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?