Hoskins v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Sheree Hoskins
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00042
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sheree Hoskins. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Parish, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by General Motors LLC (Hooper, Sanford)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/21/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2020 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/22/2019. (AML, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hooper, Sanford)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/30/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on January 29, 2019. (KLWa, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by General Motors LLC.(Hooper, Sanford)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on January 28, 2019. (RLK)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on January 28, 2019. (RLK)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on January 28, 2019. (RLK)
January 28, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (RLK)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by General Motors LLC. (Hooper, Sanford)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 1-438-18. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3874331), filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Other Civil Cover)(Hooper, Sanford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoskins v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheree Hoskins
Represented By: Geoffrey G Gaia
Represented By: Daniel Vincent Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Sanford Graham Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?