Miller v. Jefferson County, Tennessee et al (PLR1)

Plaintiff: Paul D. Miller
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe, Tyler Denkenberger, Dakota Buchanan, Hunter Donahoo, Jefferson County, Tennessee and Morgan Ramsay
Case Number: 3:2019cv00050
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin C Burchette on behalf of Dakota Buchanan, Tyler Denkenberger, Hunter Donahoo, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Morgan Ramsay (Burchette, Caitlin)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' response shall be due April 30, 2019. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 3/7/2019. This entry constitutes the complete order of the court. (PAF, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Dakota Buchanan, Tyler Denkenberger, Hunter Donahoo, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Morgan Ramsay. (Knight, Arthur)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' response shall be due March 30, 2019. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 3/4/2019. This entry constitutes the complete order of the court. (PAF, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Dakota Buchanan, Tyler Denkenberger, Hunter Donahoo, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Morgan Ramsay. (Knight, Arthur)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur F Knight, III on behalf of Dakota Buchanan, Tyler Denkenberger, Hunter Donahoo, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Morgan Ramsay (Knight, Arthur)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/11/19. (ABF)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/11/19. (ABF)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/11/19. (ABF)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dakota Buchanan, Tyler Denkenberger, Hunter Donahoo, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Morgan Ramsay. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jefferson County, #2 Summons Morgan Ramsey, #3 Summons Hunter Donahoo, #4 Summons Dakota Buchanan)(ABF)
February 8, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3888172.), filed by Paul D. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Jefferson County, #3 Summons Tyler Denkenberger, #4 Summons Hunter Donahoo, #5 Summons Morgan Ramsay, #6 Summons Dakota Buchanan)(Collins, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Jefferson County, Tennessee et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Denkenberger
Represented By: Caitlin C Burchette
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Buchanan
Represented By: Caitlin C Burchette
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Donahoo
Represented By: Caitlin C Burchette
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County, Tennessee
Represented By: Caitlin C Burchette
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Ramsay
Represented By: Caitlin C Burchette
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D. Miller
Represented By: Richard Everett Collins
Represented By: Dan C Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?