Zelaya et al v. Miles et al (PLR1)

Plaintiff: Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Isabel Zelaya, Martha Pulido, Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Geronimo Guerrero, Luis Bautista Martinez and Maria Del Pilar Gonzalez Cruz
Defendant: Billy Riggins, M. Grooms, Robert Hammer, Does #1-30, William Hinkle, Scott Pa, David Vicente, Francisco Ayala, Jere Miles, Anthony Martin, Tommy Pannell, James Liles, Dennis Fetting, Wayne Hinkle, Wayne Dickey, Deni Bukvic, Jonathan Hendrix, Joshua McCready, Robert Whited, Bobby Smith, Trey Lund, Ronald Appel, Matthew Grooms, Jerrol S Partin, Jeffrey Schroder, Theodore Francisco, Jeffery Klinko, Trevor Christianson, George Nalley, Does 1-20, Agents of ICE and Agents of US Customs and Border Protection, Bradley Harris, Brenda Dickson, David Lodge, Blake Diamond, Travis Carrier, Kashif Chowhan, Nicholas R Worsham, Connie Stephens, Glen Blache, Michelle Evans, Ricky Thornburgh, Troy McCarter, Clint Cantrell, Shannon Hope, Keith Hale, Michael Perez, Paul Criswell, John Witsell and Ryan Hubbard
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00062
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 92 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Robert Whited by Maria Del Pilar Gonzalez Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 19, 2019 Filing 91 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Joshua McCready by Maria Del Pilar Gonzalez Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 19, 2019 Filing 90 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Troy McCarter by Maria Del Pilar Gonzalez Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 19, 2019 Filing 89 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Blake Diamond by Maria Del Pilar Gonzalez Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 19, 2019 Filing 88 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Ronald Appel by Maria Del Pilar Gonzalez Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 19, 2019 Filing 87 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Wayne Dickey by Maria Del Pilar Gonzalez Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 17, 2019 Filing 86 Summons Issued as to Glen Blache, Deni Bukvic, Clint Cantrell, Kashif Chowhan, Brenda Dickson, Dennis Fetting, Keith Hale, Jonathan Hendrix, David Lodge, George Nalley, Tommy Pannell, Michael Perez, Connie Stephens, Ricky Thornburgh, John Witsell. (Attachments: #1 Summons Clint Cantrell, #2 Summons Connie Stephens, #3 Summons David Lodge, #4 Summons Deni Bukvic, #5 Summons Dennis Fetting, #6 Summons George Nalley, #7 Summons Glen Blache, #8 Summons John Witsell, #9 Summons Jonathan Hendrix, #10 Summons Kashif Chowhan, #11 Summons Keith Hale, #12 Summons Michael Perez, #13 Summons Ricky Thornburgh, #14 Summons Tommy Pannell)(ABF)
April 16, 2019 Filing 85 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Tommy Pannell by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 84 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Ricky Thornburgh by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 83 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Michael Perez by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 82 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Keith Hale by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 81 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Kashif Chowhan by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 80 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Jonathan Hendrix by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 79 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for John Witsell by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 78 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Glen Blache by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 77 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for George Nalley by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 76 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for George Nalley by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 75 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Dennis Fetting by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 74 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Deni Bukvic by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 73 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for David Lodge by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 72 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Connie Stephens by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 71 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Clint Cantrell by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 16, 2019 Filing 70 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Brenda Dickson by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 15, 2019 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. Nicholas R Worsham served on 4/13/2019. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 15, 2019 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. Jerrol S Partin served on 4/12/2019. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 15, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION to Quash (United States' Motion to Quash, in part, the Subpoena Issued to The Department of Homeland Security) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to DHS)(Saffles, Kenny)
April 12, 2019 Filing 66 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. Trevor Christianson served on 4/11/2019. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 12, 2019 Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. Theodore Francisco served on 4/11/2019. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #63 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 4/12/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 4/15/2019 to note c/m to Arthur R Bookout , Eben P Colby and Jeremy Berman along with ECF info (ADA).
April 10, 2019 Pursuant to #46 Order, the Clerk's Office received redacted PDFs from the parties on 4/10/2019. All unredacted PDFs identified in #46 order have been replaced with the redacted PDF versions and unsealed on the docket. (KMK)
April 10, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeremy A. Berman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3941015.) filed by Isabel Zelaya, #63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eben P. Colby ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3941021.) filed by Isabel Zelaya, #62 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Arthur R. Bookout ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3941020.) filed by Isabel Zelaya (ABF)
April 9, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eben P. Colby ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3941021.) by Isabel Zelaya. (Farringer, John)
April 9, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Arthur R. Bookout ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3941020.) by Isabel Zelaya. (Farringer, John)
April 9, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeremy A. Berman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3941015.) by Isabel Zelaya. (Farringer, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #57 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Email from ICE received on April 5, 2019, #3 Exhibit C - Email from Kenny Saffles received on April 5, 2019)(Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 8, 2019 Filing 59 Administrative Notice to Counsel re: #58 Memorandum in Support of Motion: The main PDF for doc. 58 (Memorandum in Support) is a duplicate PDF of doc. 57 (Motion to Amend/Revise). Counsel is directed to refile the Memorandum in Support, including all attachments, with the correct PDFs. Requirements due by 4/15/2019. (KMK, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 58 (to be refiled with correct PDF per #59 Notice of Deficiency) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #57 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint EXPEDIATED Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amened Complaint and Exs, #2 Exhibit B - Email from ICE, #3 Exhibit C - Email from AUSA Saffles)(Martinez-Olguin, Araceli) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (KMK, ).
April 5, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 5, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya re #47 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION (Martinez-Olguin, Araceli)
April 5, 2019 Filing 55 Summons Issued as to Travis Carrier, Trevor Christianson, Theodore Francisco, Jerrol S Partin, Nicholas R Worsham (Attachments: #1 Summons Nicholas Worsham, #2 Summons Theodore Francisco, #3 Summons Travis Carrier, #4 Summons Trevor Christiansen)(ABF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. Matthew Grooms served on 4/3/2019. (Keaney, Melissa)
April 5, 2019 Filing 53 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Nicholas R. Worsham by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Keaney, Melissa)
April 5, 2019 Filing 52 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Jerrol Scott Partin by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Keaney, Melissa)
April 5, 2019 Filing 51 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Theodore Francisco by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Keaney, Melissa)
April 5, 2019 Filing 50 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Trevor Christensen by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Keaney, Melissa)
April 5, 2019 Filing 49 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Amended Complaint, SUMMONS for Travis Carrier by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Keaney, Melissa)
April 4, 2019 Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IRS Search Warrant, #2 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Search Warrant)(Stewart, Meredith)
April 4, 2019 Filing 47 (Withdrawn per #56 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion) MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Other Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 2 - Minute Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Renewed Motion, #5 Exhibit 4 - Transcript April 3 Hearing, #6 Exhibit 5 - Notice of ICE Intent to Comply, #7 Exhibit 6 - Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion, #8 Exhibit 7 - Counsel Email Exchange, #9 Other Proposed Order)(Keaney, Melissa) Modified on 4/8/2019 (KMK, ).
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #27 Motion for Protective Order. The parties are DIRECTED to work together to make appropriate redactions on the documents that have been filed that contain personal information and to submit these documents on a CD or flash drive to the Clerks office. The Clerk will replace the unredacted documents with the redacted documents once they are received. The Clerk SHALL temporarily seal the following documents: [Doc. 1], [Doc. 1-4], [Doc. 1-9], [Doc. 1-11], [Doc. 1-13], [Docs. 9-10], [Doc. 12], [Docs. 16-17], [Docs. 18-19], and [Doc. 25]. The Clerk will automatically unseal the documents on April 12, 2019, should the redacted documents not be received. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 4/4/19. (ABF)
April 3, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Proceedings held on 04/01/2019, before Judge H. Bruce Guyton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebekah Lockwood, Telephone number (865) 210-6698. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2019. (RML, )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Expedited Discovery. The Court finds that Plaintiffs may issue their subpoena to theDepartment of Homeland Security. The Court declines to order Defendant Miles to respond to theinterrogatories at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 4/2/2019. (MDG)
April 2, 2019 Filing 43 COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Rebekah Lockwood (865) 210-6698 of Motion Hearing before Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 04/01/2019. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of TN before Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 04/01/2019. By s/ Rebekah Lockwood (865) 210-6698. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (RML, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. Robert Hammer served on 3/25/2019. (Keaney, Melissa) Modified on 4/2/2019 to note Attorney contacted Clerk's Office to advise that original summons returned executed as to Robert Hammer was served at wrong address. This summons returned executed was the correct address (RLK).
April 1, 2019 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2019 re #9 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Take Expedited Discovery filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Geronimo Guerrero, #27 MOTION for Protective Order (United States' Statement of Interest and Motion for Entry of Protective Order) filed by United States of America. Arguments heard. Court took matter under advisement. Order to enter.(Court Reporter ECRO) (MDG)
March 29, 2019 Filing 40 LOCAL RULE 7.1(d) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF to #9 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Take Expedited Discovery Sur-Reply by Jere Miles filed by Jere Miles. (Saffles, Kenny)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 3/29/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
March 27, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Take Expedited Discovery, #27 MOTION for Protective Order (United States' Statement of Interest and Motion for Entry of Protective Order) : Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton. (MDG)
March 26, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Protective Order (United States' Statement of Interest and Motion for Entry of Protective Order) filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Email Exchange between Plaintiffs Counsel and Counsel for the United States))(Keaney, Melissa)
March 25, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. Francisco Ayala served on 3/19/2019. (Keaney, Melissa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 36 Alias Summons Issued as to M. Grooms, Anthony Martin, Billy Riggins. (Attachments: #1 Summons Redacted - Anthony Martin, #2 Summons Redacted - M Grooms)(ABF)
March 20, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya Alias Summons for M. Grooms_Redacted per PO (Keaney, Melissa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya Alias Summons for Anthony Martin_Redacted per PO (Keaney, Melissa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya Alias Summons for Billy Riggins (Keaney, Melissa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 32 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido as to M. Grooms. (Keaney, Melissa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 31 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido as to Anthony Martin. (Keaney, Melissa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 30 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido as to Billy Riggins. (Keaney, Melissa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. David Vicente served on 3/18/2019. (Keaney, Melissa)
March 19, 2019 Filing 28 Refiled as doc 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to David Vicente on 3/18/19 (Keaney, Melissa) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (ABF). Modified on 3/20/2019 to seal document. Pursuant to Protective order the address should be redacted and PDF was not properly redacted. (JAN, ).
March 18, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Protective Order (United States' Statement of Interest and Motion for Entry of Protective Order) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Article, "Anarchy Breaks out in Portland, With the Mayor's Blessing")(Saffles, Kenny)
March 15, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery by Jere Miles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant Jere Miles' Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery)(Saffles, Kenny)
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Take Expedited Discovery filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to DHS, #2 Exhibit B - March 12 2019 Emails)(Solorzano, Julia) (Main Document 25 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ).
March 8, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Take Expedited Discovery filed by Jere Miles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jere Miles)(Saffles, Kenny)
March 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Walker McClanahan on behalf of Jere Miles (McClanahan, Leah)
March 8, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenny L Saffles on behalf of Jere Miles (Saffles, Kenny)
February 28, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, Pro Hac Vice Motions, Motion to Take Expedited Discovery Sent by Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested served on United States Attorney General on 02/28/19, filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Farringer, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. (Farringer, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. Robert Hammer served on 2/26/2019. (Farringer, John) (Main Document 19 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ).
February 28, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. Jere Miles served on 2/26/2019. (Farringer, John) (Main Document 18 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ).
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to William Hinkle. (ABF) (Main Document 17 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ).
February 26, 2019 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,, Summons to William Hinkle by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Farringer, John) (Main Document 16 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/26/19. (ABF)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/26/19. (ABF)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/26/19. (ABF)
February 26, 2019 No summons for William Hinkle received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to William Hinkle. (ABF)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Francisco Ayala, M. Grooms, Robert Hammer, Anthony Martin, Jere Miles, Scott Pa, Billy Riggins, David Vicente. (Attachments: #1 Summons Robert Hammer, #2 Summons David Vicente, #3 Summons Francisco Ayala, #4 Summons Billy Riggins, #5 Summons Anthony Martin, #6 Summons M Grooms, #7 Summons Scott Pa, #8 Summons US Attorney General, #9 Summons US Attorney)(ABF) (Main Document 12 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 5 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 6 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 7 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 8 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 9 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 2/26/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 2/26/2019 to indicate c/m to all non-ECF users (ABF).
February 26, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nora Preciado ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898467.) filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Geronimo Guerrero, #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Phillip Cramer ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898450.) filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Geronimo Guerrero, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Araceli Martinez-Olguin ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3901634.) filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Geronimo Guerrero, #9 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Take Expedited Discovery filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Geronimo Guerrero, #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William Harbison ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898443.) filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Geronimo Guerrero, #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Melissa Keaney ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898458.) filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Geronimo Guerrero, #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Meredith Stewart ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898453.) filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Geronimo Guerrero, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Julia Solorzano ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898464.) filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Geronimo Guerrero (ABF)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Take Expedited Discovery filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B: Apr. 10, 2018 FOIA Requests to DHS-ICE, #3 Exhibit C: ICE Response to Apr. 10, 2018 FOIA, #4 Exhibit D: Dec. 7, 2018 FOIA Request to DHS-ICE, #5 Exhibit E: Apr. 11, 2018 PRA Request to THP, #6 Exhibit F: Excerpt from THP Response to Apr. 11, 2018 Request, #7 Exhibit G: Jun. 5, 2018 US Congress Letter to DHS, #8 Exhibit H: DHS Response to US Congress, #9 Exhibit I: Feb. 22, 2019 Declaration of Jessica Hahn, #10 Exhibit J: Feb. 25, 2019 Declaration of Julia Solorzano)(Farringer, John) (Main Document 10 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 5 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 6 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 7 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 8 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 9 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 10 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ).
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Take Expedited Discovery by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Farringer, John) (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ).
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Araceli Martinez-Olguin ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3901634.) by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Farringer, John)
February 22, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (RLK)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nora Preciado ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898467.) by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Farringer, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Julia Solorzano ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898464.) by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Farringer, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Melissa Keaney ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898458.) by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Farringer, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Meredith Stewart ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898453.) by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Farringer, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Phillip Cramer ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898450.) by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Farringer, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William Harbison ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3898443.) by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Luis Bautista Martinez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Martha Pulido, Isabel Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Farringer, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3898430.), filed by Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz, Geronimo Guerrero, Isabel Zelaya, Catarino Zapote Hernandez, Carolina Romulo Mendoza, Luis Bautista Martinez, Martha Pulido. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1: IRS Search Warrant, #3 Exhibit 2: Affidavit in Support of a Search Warrant, #4 Summons Vicente, #5 Summons US Attorney General, #6 Summons US Attorney ED Tennessee, #7 Summons Pa, #8 Summons Riggins, #9 Summons Miles, #10 Summons Martin, #11 Summons Hammer, #12 Summons Grooms, #13 Summons Ayala)(Farringer, John) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 9 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 11 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ). (Attachment 13 replaced on 4/10/2019) (KMK, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zelaya et al v. Miles et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Riggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does #1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Pa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Vicente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jere Miles
Represented By: Leah Walker McClanahan
Represented By: Kenny L Saffles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Pannell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Fetting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deni Bukvic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua McCready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Whited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trey Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrol S Partin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Klinko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Nalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, Agents of ICE and Agents of US Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kashif Chowhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas R Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Blache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Thornburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy McCarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Hope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Witsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catarino Zapote Hernandez
Represented By: John L Farringer, IV
Represented By: William L Harbison
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Philip F Cramer
Represented By: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Represented By: Arthur R Bookout
Represented By: Jeremy Berman
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Julia Solorzano
Represented By: Eben P Colby
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Zelaya
Represented By: John L Farringer, IV
Represented By: William L Harbison
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Philip F Cramer
Represented By: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Represented By: Arthur R Bookout
Represented By: Jeremy Berman
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Julia Solorzano
Represented By: Eben P Colby
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Pulido
Represented By: John L Farringer, IV
Represented By: William L Harbison
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Philip F Cramer
Represented By: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Represented By: Arthur R Bookout
Represented By: Jeremy Berman
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Julia Solorzano
Represented By: Eben P Colby
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Pilar Gonza Cruz
Represented By: John L Farringer, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Romulo Mendoza
Represented By: John L Farringer, IV
Represented By: William L Harbison
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Philip F Cramer
Represented By: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Represented By: Arthur R Bookout
Represented By: Jeremy Berman
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Julia Solorzano
Represented By: Eben P Colby
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geronimo Guerrero
Represented By: John L Farringer, IV
Represented By: William L Harbison
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Philip F Cramer
Represented By: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Represented By: Arthur R Bookout
Represented By: Jeremy Berman
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Julia Solorzano
Represented By: Eben P Colby
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Bautista Martinez
Represented By: John L Farringer, IV
Represented By: William L Harbison
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Philip F Cramer
Represented By: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Represented By: Arthur R Bookout
Represented By: Jeremy Berman
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Julia Solorzano
Represented By: Eben P Colby
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Pilar Gonzalez Cruz
Represented By: John L Farringer, IV
Represented By: William L Harbison
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Philip F Cramer
Represented By: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Represented By: Arthur R Bookout
Represented By: Jeremy Berman
Represented By: Meredith B Stewart
Represented By: Julia Solorzano
Represented By: Eben P Colby
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: Kenny L Saffles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?