McCoy v. Coffey et al
Plaintiff: Marcwell Mack McCoy
Defendant: Jeff Coffey and Glenn Ballenger
Case Number: 3:2019cv00063
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marcwell McCoy re #5 Order to Show Cause. Informational lookup did not provide any further contact information. (AML, )
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within fourteen (14) days, explaining why his case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute and/or failure to follow the orders of this Court. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/1/2019. (AML, ) Mailed to Marcwell McCoy
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filingfee or to submit the necessary documents. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/25/2019. (AML, ) Copy of Order and IFP Application Packet mailed to Marcwell McCoy
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (c/m to Marcwell Mack McCoy, JEFFERSON COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT, P O BOX 1108, DANDRIDGE, TN 37725) (ABF)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Glenn Ballenger, Jeff Coffey, filed by Marcwell Mack McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(ABF)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcwell Mack McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(ABF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Coffey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Ballenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcwell Mack McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?