Pearcy v. Nations Recovery Center, Inc. et al (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Christopher Pearcy
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC and Nations Recovery Center, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00064
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Christopher Pearcy (Philipps, David)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Pearcy. LVNV Funding, LLC served on 2/25/2019. (Philipps, David) Modified on 3/21/2019 to note that the attached form was not the one issued by the Court (ADA).
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Pearcy. Nations Recovery Center, Inc. served on 2/25/2019. (Philipps, David) Modified on 3/21/2019 to note that the attached form was not the one issued by the Court (ADA).
March 14, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Case Reported Settled By Attorney David Philipps; Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. Stipulation of dismissal forthcoming. (RLK)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/22/2019. (BJL, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/22/2019. (BJL, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/22/2019. (BJL, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Appearance : Informational Only. (BJL, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nations Recovery Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 as to Summons LVNV Funding, LLC)(BJL, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia T Lawson on behalf of Christopher Pearcy (Lawson, Cynthia)
February 22, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (BJL, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Elizabeth Ellis Banks on behalf of Christopher Pearcy (Banks, Heather)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E Philipps on behalf of Christopher Pearcy (Philipps, Mary)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LVNV Funding, LLC, Nations Recovery Center, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3899566.), filed by Christopher Pearcy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Other Disclosure Statement, #8 Summons Nations Recovery Center, #9 Summons LVNV Funding)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearcy v. Nations Recovery Center, Inc. et al (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Pearcy
Represented By: Cynthia T Lawson
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Ellis Banks
Represented By: David J Philipps
Represented By: Mary E Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nations Recovery Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?