Gold's Southeast, LLC v. West 2 East Land, LP et al (PLR1)

Plaintiff: Gold's Southeast, LLC
Defendant: Martin E O'Boyle and West 2 East Land, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00163
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate Judge by Gold's Southeast, LLC (Dill, Benjamin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dill, Benjamin)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 11/17/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/29/19. (ABF)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 5/23/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 5/24/2019 to indicate c/m to Eli Jason Mackey and Benjamin Dill (ABF).
May 22, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Benjamin F. Dill ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3977661.) filed by Gold's Southeast, LLC, #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Eli Jason S. Mackey ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3977656.) filed by Gold's Southeast, LLC (ABF)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Benjamin F. Dill ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3977661.) by Gold's Southeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing - EDVA)(Haskell, Matthew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Eli Jason S. Mackey ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3977656.) by Gold's Southeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing - EDVA)(Haskell, Matthew)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 5/17/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Hilary Dennen on 5/20/2019 (JBR).
May 15, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Hilary C. Dennen filed by Gold's Southeast, LLC (ABF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Hilary C. Dennen Certificate of Good Standing (MDTN) - Hilary C. Dennen by Gold's Southeast, LLC. (Haskell, Matthew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Hilary Dennen re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Hilary C. Dennen: A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. If the required certificate is not submitted within 15 days of this Notice, your motion may be summarily denied. (c/m to Hilary Dennen) (ABF)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Hilary C. Dennen by Gold's Southeast, LLC. (Haskell, Matthew)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Gold's Southeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Hearing in Blount County Circuit Court - May 9, 2019)(SAC)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Gold's Southeast, LLC. (SAC, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Martin E O'Boyle, West 2 East Land, LP. (Attachments: #1 Other Plaintiff's Counsel)(Graves, Richard)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent Form) (SAC)Order mailed to Dill, Setliff, Mackey and Dennen.
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/9/2019. (SAC)Order mailed to Dill, Setliff, Mackey and Dennen.
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/9/2019. (SAC)Order mailed to Dill, Setliff, Mackey and Dennen.
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/9/2019. (SAC)Order mailed to Dill, Setliff, Mackey and Dennen.
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) : Attorneys Mackey and Dill. (SAC)Notice mailed to Attorneys Mackey and Dill.
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel Setliff and Dennen requirements due by 5/14/2019. (SAC)Mailed to Setliff and Dennen.
May 9, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (SAC)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel requirements due by 5/9/2019. (SAC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Blount County Circuit Court, case number L-20182. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3967644), filed by Martin E O'Boyle, West 2 East Land, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summonses, #2 Exhibit Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #5 Exhibit Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit Order, #7 Exhibit Surety Bond, #8 Exhibit Motion for Temporary Injunction, #9 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #10 Exhibit Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing, #11 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Graves, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold's Southeast, LLC v. West 2 East Land, LP et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin E O'Boyle
Represented By: Richard Edmund Graves
Represented By: Michael W Ewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West 2 East Land, LP
Represented By: Richard Edmund Graves
Represented By: Michael W Ewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold's Southeast, LLC
Represented By: Charles S Setliff
Represented By: Eli Jason S Mackey
Represented By: Benjamin F Dill
Represented By: Hilary Claire Dennen
Represented By: Matthew Bryant Haskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?