Underwriters At Lloyd's v. Pharma Packaging Solutions (TV2)
Plaintiff: Underwriters At Lloyd's
Defendant: Pharma Packaging Solutions
Case Number: 3:2019cv00170
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Complaint to July 22, 2019 by Underwriters At Lloyd's. (Leland, Kipp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant on May 16, 2019, filed by Underwriters At Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Carton Service, Inc. Corporate Listing, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Delivery Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - FedEx Shipment History)(Leland, Kipp)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrick L O'Dell on behalf of Pharma Packaging Solutions (O'Dell, Darrick)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 5/23/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 5/24/2019 to indicate c/m to David Maloof, John Eric Olson and Kipp Leland (ABF).
May 22, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John Eric Olson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3978716.) filed by Underwriters At Lloyd's, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Maloof ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3978735.) filed by Underwriters At Lloyd's, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kipp C. Leland ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3978728.) filed by Underwriters At Lloyd's (ABF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Maloof ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3978735.) by Underwriters At Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Phillips, J)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kipp C. Leland ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3978728.) by Underwriters At Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Phillips, J)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John Eric Olson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3978716.) by Underwriters At Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Phillips, J)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/19. (ABF)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/19. (ABF)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/19. (ABF)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pharma Packaging Solutions. (ABF)
May 10, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pharma Packaging Solutions ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3969704.), filed by Underwriters At Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Other Corporate Disclosure)(Phillips, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwriters At Lloyd's v. Pharma Packaging Solutions (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Underwriters At Lloyd's
Represented By: J Britt Phillips
Represented By: Kipp C Leland
Represented By: John Eric Olson
Represented By: Christopher James Schroeck
Represented By: David T Maloof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharma Packaging Solutions
Represented By: Darrick L O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?