Cook v. Berrong et al

Plaintiff: Jamie W. Cook
Defendant: Class Officer Ingles, Sheriff Berrong and Chief Cantrell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00172
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable "Released." Mail sent to Jamie W Cook re #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (JBR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jamie W. Cook re #5 Order (ABF)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/18/19. (c/m to Jamie W. Cook #1422826, KNOX COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY, 5001 MALONEYVILLE ROAD, KNOXVILLE, TN 37918) (ABF)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jamie W. Cook re #5 Order. (remailed to plaintiff's new address - Jamie W. Cook #1422826, KNOX COUNTYDETENTION FACILITY, 5001 MALONEYVILLE ROAD, KNOXVILLE, TN 37918) (ABF)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and NOTICE of Change of Address by Jamie W. Cook. (JBR) Modified to reflect address changed from P.O. Box 429, Lovejoy, GA 30250 to Knox County Detention Facility on 6/4/2019 (JBR).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary documents. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a prison account statement form. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/21/2019. (copy mailed to plaintiff w/ form to Jamie W. Cook #74089, P.O. Box 429, Lovejoy, GA 30250) (KMK)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jamie W. Cook. (KMK, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (c/m to Jamie W. Cook #74089, P.O. Box 429, Lovejoy, GA 30250) (ABF)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamie W. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(ABF)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamie W. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(ABF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Berrong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Class Officer Ingles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Berrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie W. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?