Douglas v. United States (PLR1)

Plaintiff: Darrell Lynn Douglas
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 3:2019cv00177
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Thomas W Phillips no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Pamela L Reeves for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/3/19. (copy mailed to Darrell Lynn Douglas) (JBR) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (JBR).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 06/27/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Darrell Douglas) (AMP)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 06/27/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Darrell Douglas) (AMP)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 06/27/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Darrell Douglas) (AMP)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above- captioned case is related to United States of America v. Darrell Lynn Douglas, No. 3:08-CV-500. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas W. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Thomas W. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 06/27/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Darrell Douglas) (AMP)
June 27, 2019 District Judge Thomas W Phillips and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Pro Se and Use Electronic Case Files by Darrell Lynn Douglas. (AYB)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (Copy of Summons mailed to Darrell Lynn Douglas) (AMP)
May 16, 2019 The case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Poplin for related case determination. (AMP)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Darrell Lynn Douglas against United States, filed by Darrell Lynn Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Douglas, Darrell) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2019: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K) (AMP). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/16/2019) (RET).
May 16, 2019 Filing fee $ 400.00 paid electronically - receipt number 0649-3973745 (KMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas v. United States (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Lynn Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?