Shiels et al v. Orange Lake Country Club, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carol M. Shiels, Andrew M. Shiels, Sara W. Shiels and Robert D. Shiels
Defendant: Orange Lake Country Club, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00216
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT re #11 Memorandum & Opinion. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/24/2019. (BDG) Memo and Judgment mailed to Joshua Vernon Hoeppner.
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 7) is GRANTED.Plaintiffs claims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/24/2019. (BDG)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Scheduling Conference RESCHEDULED for 8/6/2019, at 11:30 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 7/1/2019. (CEA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Substituting Counsel by Joshua I. Goldman, Esq. and Joshua Hoeppner, Esq. by Andrew M. Shiels, Carol M. Shiels, Robert D. Shiels, Sara W. Shiels. (Goldman, Joshua)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Orange Lake Country Club, Inc.. (Vance, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Orange Lake Country Club, Inc.. (Vance, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019, at 11:30 AM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 6/14/2019. (CEA)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 06/14/2019. (CAT)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 06/14/2019. (CAT)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 06/14/2019. (CAT)
June 14, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CAT)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Orange Lake Country Club, Inc.. (Vance, Robert)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sevier County Circuit Court, case number 19-cv-149. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3997401), filed by Orange Lake Country Club, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Michael Thompson, #3 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Written Notice to Adverse Parties, #5 Supplement Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Vance, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shiels et al v. Orange Lake Country Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol M. Shiels
Represented By: Joshua Isaac Goldman
Represented By: Joshua Vernon Hoeppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew M. Shiels
Represented By: Joshua Isaac Goldman
Represented By: Joshua Vernon Hoeppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara W. Shiels
Represented By: Joshua Isaac Goldman
Represented By: Joshua Vernon Hoeppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Shiels
Represented By: Joshua Isaac Goldman
Represented By: Joshua Vernon Hoeppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Lake Country Club, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?