Burke v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Alene Burke
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America, Inc. and Hyundai Motor America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00229
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Revise by Alene Burke. (Rutherford, Glen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Alene Burke. (Rutherford, Glen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Alene Burke. (Rutherford, Glen)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE within seven days of the entry of this Order why the Court should not dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/7/2019. (DJH)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Kia Motors America, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kia Motors America, Inc..(Bibb, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney Henry Kimerling on behalf of Kia Motors America, Inc. (Kimerling, Whitney)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Randolph Bibb, Jr on behalf of Kia Motors America, Inc. (Bibb, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alene Burke. Kia Motors America, Inc. served via certified mail. (AYB)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on June 21, 2019. (AYB)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on June 21, 2019. (AYB)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on June 21, 2019. (AYB)
June 21, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, or Kia Motors Corporation. (AYB)
June 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to Kia Motors America. (AYB)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee received in the amount of $400: receipt #K3038245) filed by Alene Burke. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet) (AYB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alene Burke
Represented By: Glen B Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney Henry Kimerling
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?