Benanti v. Lewin et al
Plaintiff: Michael Benanti
Defendant: Jeff Blanton, Jamie Satterfield, Unknown DOJ Employees, David P Lewin, Steven H Cook, Mick Nocera and Kelly A Norris
Case Number: 3:2019cv00237
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 19-5850 for #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Benanti. (JBR)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/6/2019. (SAC)Order mailed to Benanti.
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Judgment, #4 Order, by Michael Benanti. Filing fee $ 505, not paid. (SAC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration by Michael Benanti. (Attachments: #1 Other)(SAC)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/16/2019. (SAC)Judgment mailed to Benanti and Custodian of Accounts.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. the complaint [Doc. 1] will be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted.An appropriate Judgment Order will enter.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/16/2019. (SAC)Copy sent to finance in Knoxville. Copy of Memo mailed to Benanti and Warden's financial.
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (copy mailed to Michael Benanti at ATWATER) (JBR)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Benanti. (JBR)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 BIVENS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Benanti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O) (Clerical Note: No Exhibit A was received in original documents) (JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benanti v. Lewin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Benanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Satterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown DOJ Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven H Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick Nocera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly A Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?