Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina v. Perkins et al
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Defendant: Daniel Jacob Perkins and Gouffon Moving & Storage Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00241
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gouffon Moving & Storage Company, Inc., Daniel Jacob Perkins.(Butler, John)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 7/23/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION by All Defendants. (Butler, John)
July 22, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4028141.) filed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina (ABF)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4028141.) by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Ashworth, Gail)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Butler on behalf of All Defendants (Butler, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. Gouffon Moving & Storage Company, Inc. served on 7/5/2019. (Ashworth, Gail)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. Daniel Jacob Perkins served on 7/6/2019. (Ashworth, Gail)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Ashworth, Gail)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/3/19. (JBR)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/3/19. (JBR)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/3/19. (JBR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Gouffon)(JBR)
July 3, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JBR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4012989.), filed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Daniel Jacob Perkins, #3 Summons Gouffon Moving & Storage Company, Inc)(Ashworth, Gail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina v. Perkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Jacob Perkins
Represented By: John W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gouffon Moving & Storage Company, Inc.
Represented By: John W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Represented By: Gail Vaughn Ashworth
Represented By: Edmund Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?