Dils v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Matthew Dils
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00245
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Substitute Party. ORDERED, ADJUDGED and AGREED, that Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. be, and the same is hereby, substituted for The Coca-Cola Company as the proper party Company is therefore dismissed, with prejudice. Henceforth, and absent amendment or further order of the court, the style of the case shall be Matthew Dils v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. and Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/28/2019. (JCK)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Reset Trial. This matter is before the Court on Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion to Reset the February 29, 2021 Trial Date [Doc. 14], in which Defendants counsel states he has a vacation planned for February 29, 2021. The trial date, however, is not scheduled for February 29, 2021, but for February 9, 2021. [Scheduling Order, Doc. 13, at 10]. Defendants motion is therefore DENIED. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/28/2019. (JCK)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Joshua)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Reset Trial by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Rowlett, George)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/9/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 400 - Greeneville before District Judge J Ronnie Greer. The expected length of trial is three (3) days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 9:00 AM. Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2020. Utilization of Mediation due by 3/17/2020. Status Report due by 1/14/2020. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/20/2019. (CAT)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kern, Elle)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent Form) (JBR)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: 1. As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent)(JCK)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc..(Wolfe, Joshua)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Kern, Elle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kern, Elle)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/8/19. Serviced via US Mail to Heather Inman. (KFB)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/8/19. Serviced via US Mail to Heather Inman. (KFB)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/8/19. (KFB) Modified on 7/8/2019 (KFB). Serviced via US Mail to Heather Inman.
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to attorney Heather Inman. This noticed serviced via US Mail to Heather Inman. (KFB)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Coca-Cola Company for Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.. (Wolfe, Joshua)
July 3, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (KFB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 3-203-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4014980), filed by Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Wolfe, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dils v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Represented By: Heather G Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Represented By: Elle G Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Dils
Represented By: Lance A Evans
Represented By: Andrew O Beamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?