Cowan v. Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kaitlin Cowan
Defendant: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00246
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hatmaker, J)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Kaitlin Cowan (Ward, Joshua)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent Form) (JBR)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent CMH Services, Inc. for Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.. (Hutcherson, Kaitlyn)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.. (Hutcherson, Kaitlyn)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 07/08/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert Ethan Hargraves) (AMP)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 07/08/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert Ethan Hargraves) (AMP)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 07/08/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert Ethan Hargraves)(AMP)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Attorney Robert Ethan Hargraves is not registered for CM/ECF. Please register. Requirements due by 7/15/2019. (Copy of Notice mailed to Robert Ethan Hargraves) (AMP)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc. (AMP)
July 8, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4015167.), filed by Kaitlin Cowan. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons Vanderbilt Mortgage & Finance, Inc.)(Ward, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowan v. Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.
Represented By: J Chadwick Hatmaker
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlin Cowan
Represented By: Joshua R Ward
Represented By: Robert Ethan Hargraves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?