Tennessee Farmers Mutual Company v. Common Sense Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tennessee Farmers Mutual Company a/s/o Emily Berry and Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: The Firelands Group, LLC, Common Sense Industries, Inc. d/b/a Common Sense RC, Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc. d/b/a Hobby Town USA, Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc. and Common Sense Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00248
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively for Summary Judgment Responses due by 12/20/2019 Replies due by 1/10/2020.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/29/19. (KFB)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT of Use of Magistrate by Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company (Wilson, Shelly)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively for Summary Judgment by Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Criswell, Brandon)
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively for Summary Judgment filed by Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc.. (Pelot, Reuben)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively for Summary Judgment by Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Thomas A. Walla)(Pelot, Reuben)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc. re #14 Order, Notice of Compliance with Order Governing Motions to Dismiss (Pelot, Reuben)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Scott Criswell on behalf of Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company (Criswell, Brandon)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/2/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Dispositive Motions due by 10/20/2020.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/5/19. (KFB)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Defendant Hobby Town Unlimited is hereby ORDERED to refile its motion to dismiss and realted memorandum within 14 days of the date of this Order in a legible format. re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc., #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/5/19. (KFB)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Field, Christopher)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on July 15, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AYB)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 07/15/2019. (KLW)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by The Firelands Group, LLC.(Brown, Gregory)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/8/2019. (JCK)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/8/2019. (JCK)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/8/2019. (JCK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc. Originally filed in state court proceedings. (JCK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc. Originally filed in state court proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Case Law in Support)(JCK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively MOTION for Summary Judgment by Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc. Originally filed in state court proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JCK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc. Originally filed in state court proceedings. (JCK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Common Sense Industries, Inc. Originally filed in state court proceedings. (JCK)
July 8, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JCK)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Grainger County Circuit Court, case number 9870-11. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4015209), filed by The Firelands Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collective 1, #2 Exhibit 2- Civil Cover Sheet)(Field, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Farmers Mutual Company v. Common Sense Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Firelands Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher C Field
Represented By: William Scott Hickerson
Represented By: Gregory Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Common Sense Industries, Inc. d/b/a Common Sense RC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc. d/b/a Hobby Town USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobby Town Unlimited, Inc.
Represented By: Reuben N Pelot, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Common Sense Industries, Inc.
Represented By: W Tyler Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Farmers Mutual Company a/s/o Emily Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie D Coleman
Represented By: Shelly L Wilson
Represented By: Brandon Scott Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?