Hoover v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company (TV2)
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hoover
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00250
Filed: July 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Jonathan Hoover of Service of Initial Disclosures (Hicky, William)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to Produce Hospital and Medical Records. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/3/19. (ABF)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Produce Hospital and Medical Records by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, John)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: A final pretrial conference will be held in Knoxville on Tuesday, January 19, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. The trial of this case will be held in Knoxville before the undersigned with a jury beginning on Tuesday, January 26, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on August 27, 2019. (AYB)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Baker, John)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Baker, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Baker, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Baker, Jr on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Baker, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Baker, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Hoover. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Hicky, William)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 7/11/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
July 10, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jonathan Hoover (ABF)
July 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received: $ 90.00, receipt number 0649-4018563 (ABF)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Sorey, II : The $90.00 filing fee must be paid.If the required certificates or filing fee are not submitted within 15 days of this Notice, your motion may be summarily denied. (ABF)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Hoover. (Hicky, William)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/8/19. (ABF)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/8/19. (ABF)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/8/19. (ABF)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (ABF)
July 7, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
July 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4015335.), filed by Jonathan Hoover. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Norfolk Southern Railway Company)(Hicky, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoover v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Represented By: Emily L Herman-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hoover
Represented By: William B Hicky
Represented By: Charles Edward Sorey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?