Dibrell v. Regions Bank
Plaintiff: Calvin Lyndell Dibrell
Defendant: Regions Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00261
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & to Stay Proceedings Affidavit of Kimberly Burkhalter Townsley filed by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2003 Signature Card (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2 - AmSouth Customer Agreement for Depository Accounts, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2016 Signature Card (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 4 - May 2018 Account Statement (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 5 - 2019 Signature Card (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 6 - Regions 2018 Deposit Agreement)(Cook, Charles)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & to Stay Proceedings filed by Regions Bank. (Cook, Charles)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & to Stay Proceedings by Regions Bank. (Cook, Charles)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and Notice of Appearance by Regions Bank. (Cook, Charles) Modified text on 8/8/2019 (ABF).
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin Lyndell Dibrell. Regions Bank served on 7/18/2019. (Tooten, Terrell)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/12/19. (JBR)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/12/19. (JBR)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/12/19. (JBR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Regions Bank. (JBR)
July 12, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Calvin Lyndell Dibrell re #1 Complaint request for summons to issue (Tooten, Terrell)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Regions Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4020532.), filed by Calvin Lyndell Dibrell. (Attachments: #1 Other civil cover sheet)(Tooten, Terrell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dibrell v. Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Lyndell Dibrell
Represented By: Terrell L Tooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Charles W Cook, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?