Buchanan v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Jonathan E Buchanan
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00262
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/28/2019. (KLW)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Baker, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Baker, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Baker, Jr on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Baker, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Jonathan E Buchanan. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Wettermark, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jonathan E Buchanan re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Wettermark, James)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on July 15, 2019. (AYB)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on July 15, 2019. (AYB)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on July 15, 2019. (AYB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (AYB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel re: #1 Complaint: please file a civil cover sheet in ECF as a supplement to the complaint. (AYB)
July 12, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AYB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4021023.), filed by Jonathan E Buchanan. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wettermark, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchanan v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Emily L Herman-Thompson
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan E Buchanan
Represented By: James H Wettermark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?