Mize et al v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Rick Mize and Beverly Mize
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00270
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant SHALL respond to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents on or before September 30, 2019. Given the additional time torespond to discovery, however, the Court advises Defendant that its responses should not include boilerplate objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 9/10/19. (ABF)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Beverly Mize, Rick Mize. (Adkins, Terrill)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Woodfin, Clint)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents)(Woodfin, Clint)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/22/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2020 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/1/19. (AWS)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan)(Adkins, Terrill)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 07/16/2019. (KLW)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/15/19. (ABF)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/15/19. (ABF)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/15/19. (ABF)
July 15, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Woodfin, Clint)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Woodfin, Clint)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 1-211-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4022475), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Woodfin, Clint)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mize et al v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Mize
Represented By: Terrill L Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Mize
Represented By: Terrill L Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Clint J Woodfin
Represented By: Douglas R Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?