Harrison Construction Company, a Division of APAC-Atlantic, Inc. v. Pangea, Inc et al (PLR3)
Plaintiff: Harrison Construction Company, a Division of APAC-Atlantic, Inc.
Defendant: Pangea, Inc and North American Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00295
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent Form) (JBR)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by North American Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Swiss Re America Corp., Corporate Parent Swiss Reinsurance Company for North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Connell, Jordan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Pangea, Inc. (Connell, Jordan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by North American Specialty Insurance Company, Pangea, Inc.(Connell, Jordan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on North American Specialty Insurance Company on 8/22/2019, filed by Harrison Construction Company, a Division of APAC-Atlantic, Inc.. (Martin, Jerry)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extension of Time to File A Responsive Pleading to Complaint for Breach of Contract and Against Payment Bond Pursuant to the Miller Act by Pangea, Inc. (Connell, Jordan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Pangea, Inc. on August 7, 2019, filed by Harrison Construction Company, a Division of APAC-Atlantic, Inc.. (Martin, Jerry)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to North American Specialty Insurance Company, Pangea, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DJH)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/1/2019. (DJH)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/1/2019. (DJH)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/1/2019. (DJH)
August 1, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (DJH)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4038415.), filed by Harrison Construction Company, a Division of APAC-Atlantic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons North American Summons, #4 Summons Pangea Summons, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Martin, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison Construction Company, a Division of APAC-Atlantic, Inc. v. Pangea, Inc et al (PLR3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pangea, Inc
Represented By: Jordan Caralisa Connell
Represented By: Jeffrey S Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jordan Caralisa Connell
Represented By: Jeffrey S Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison Construction Company, a Division of APAC-Atlantic, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?