Stanton v. Washburn
Petitioner: Jacob Stanton
Respondent: Russell Washburn
Case Number: 3:2019cv00301
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT ORDER: Petitioner's federal habeas petition is DENIED, and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. A certificate of appealability from this decision is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/13/19. (AWS) Mailed to Jacob Stanton.
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Stanton's petition for a writ of habeas corpus will be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. A certificate of appealability from this decision will be DENIED. Further, the Court will CERTIFY that any appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith and would be totally frivolous. Fed. R. App. P. 24. AN APPROPRIATE ORDER WILL ENTER. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/13/19. (AWS)Mailed to Jacob Stanton.
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (copy mailed to Jacob Stanton #505090, Trousdale Turner Correctional Center, 140 Macon Way, Hartsville, TN 37074 (KMK)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from the Middle District of Tennessee; Case Number 3:19-cv-00574.
July 31, 2019 ***This action has been TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee, Northern Division.*** (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/9/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Petitioner Jacob Stanton, an inmate at the Trousdale Turner Correctional Center in Hartsville, Tennessee, filed a pro se Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 in this Court on July 9, 2019. (Doc. No. #1 .) The venue provision of 28 U.S.C. 2241(d) provides for concurrent jurisdiction to entertain a habeas petition in the judicial district where Petitioner was convicted and the district where he is currently located. Accordingly, pursuant to this Court's authority to "transfer any civil action to any other district or division where it might have been brought," 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee, Northern Division. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/31/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/9/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Bledsoe, III on behalf of Russell Washburn (Bledsoe, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/9/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (as) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/9/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 RECEIPT #34675055544 in the amount of $5.00 posted by Jacob Stanton re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (am) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/9/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (as) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/9/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jacob Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Document 1, #2 Supporting Document 2, #3 Supporting Document 3, #4 Supporting Document 4)(as) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanton v. Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Russell Washburn
Represented By: John H Bledsoe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacob Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?