Paine, Tarwater, and Bickers, LLP et al v. Harrison
Plaintiff: Michael J King, John W. Elder, Paine Tarwater and Bickers, LLP, Thomas A. Bickers, Taylor A. Williams, Paine, Tarwater, and Bickers, LLP and Michael J. King
Defendant: Ryan L. Harrison
Case Number: 3:2019cv00318
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paine, Tarwater, and Bickers, LLP, John W. Elder, Michael J. King, Thomas A. Bickers, Taylor A. Williams. Ryan L. Harrison waiver sent on 8/22/2019. (Carpenter, W)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Paine, Tarwater, and Bickers, LLP. (Carpenter, W)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/19/2019. (CAT)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/19/2019. (CAT)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/19/2019. (CAT)
August 19, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Paine, Tarwater, and Bickers, LLP. (CAT)
August 19, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Ryan L. Harrison. (CAT)
August 19, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CAT)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan L. Harrison ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4052291.), filed by Paine Tarwater and Bickers, LLP, John W. Elder, Michael J King, Thomas A. Bickers, Taylor A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Partnership Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Withdrawal, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Carpenter, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paine, Tarwater, and Bickers, LLP et al v. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J King
Represented By: W Kyle Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Elder
Represented By: W Kyle Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paine Tarwater and Bickers, LLP
Represented By: W Kyle Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Bickers
Represented By: W Kyle Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor A. Williams
Represented By: W Kyle Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paine, Tarwater, and Bickers, LLP
Represented By: W Kyle Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. King
Represented By: W Kyle Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan L. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?