Joy v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Dale Louise Joy
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00320
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Woodfin, Clint)
October 10, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order (ABF)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC Service of Rule 26 (a)(1)(A) Disclosures (Firkins, Andrew)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/3/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2020 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/9/19. (AWS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Firkins, Andrew)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/23/2019. (KLW)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Firkins, Andrew)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/20/19. (ABF)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/20/19. (ABF)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/20/19. (ABF)
August 20, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Woodfin, Clint)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Blount Circuit, case number L-20260. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4054050), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Woodfin, Clint)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joy v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Louise Joy
Represented By: T Kenan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Clint J Woodfin
Represented By: Andrew N. Firkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?