Petree v. Huckeba et al
Plaintiff: Joy Petree
Defendant: Wayne E Huckeba, Southland International Trucks, Inc., One World Logistics of America, Inc. and Honda Logistics North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00329
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by One World Logistics of America, Inc.. (ABF)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, by One World Logistics of America, Inc..(O'Neal, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Wayne E Huckeba.(O'Neal, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Honda Logistics North America, Inc. by Joy Petree (Erwin, Jacob)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Southland International Trucks, Inc. by Joy Petree (Erwin, Jacob)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Southland International Trucks, Inc.. (Spainhour, Charles)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Southland International Trucks, Inc. (AYB)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Southland International Trucks, Inc..(Spainhour, Charles)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joy Petree. One World Logistics of America, Inc. served on 9/12/2019. (Erwin, Jacob)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joy Petree. Honda Logistics North America, Inc. served on 9/12/2019. (Erwin, Jacob)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joy Petree. Wayne E Huckeba served on 9/7/2019. (Erwin, Jacob)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Honda Logistics North America, Inc. and One World Logistics of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons for One World Logistics) (AYB)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Honda Logistics North America, Inc., One World Logistics of America, Inc.., filed by Joy Petree. (Attachments: #1 Summons Honda Logistics North America, Inc., #2 Summons One World Logistics of America, Inc.)(Erwin, Jacob)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint [Doc. 6] is GRANTED. Plaintiff SHALL FILE her First Amended Complaint [Doc. 6-1] as her operative pleading in CM/ECF on or before September 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on September 11, 2019. (AYB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joy Petree. Southland International Trucks, Inc. served on 8/27/2019. (Erwin, Jacob)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Revise #1 Complaint, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Joy Petree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Summons Honda Logistics North America, Inc., #3 Summons One World Logistics of America, Inc.)(Erwin, Jacob)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/26/2019. (JCK)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/26/2019. (JCK)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/26/2019. (JCK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wayne E Huckeba, Southland International Trucks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Southland International Trucks, Inc.)(JCK)
August 26, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JCK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4060414.), filed by Joy Petree. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Wayne E. Huckeba, #3 Summons Southland International Trucks, Inc.)(Erwin, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petree v. Huckeba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Petree
Represented By: Jacob Edward Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne E Huckeba
Represented By: Michael Patrick Taylor O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southland International Trucks, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A Stewart, III
Represented By: Charles Frederick Spainhour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Logistics of America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Patrick Taylor O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Logistics North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?