Mohanty et al v. Wiegand Sports, LLC et al (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Palvi N Mohanty, Subash C Mohanty and Palvi Mohanty
Defendant: Wiegand Sports, LLC, Gatlinburg Mountain Coasters, LLC, Josef Wiegand GmbH & Co. KG, Wiegand Sports GmbH and Gatlinburg Mountain Coaster, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00330
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Gatlinburg Mountain Coaster, LLC. (Hurt, Rachel)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Gatlinburg Mountain Coaster, LLC.(Hurt, Rachel)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Pltf's Amended Complaint by Gatlinburg Mountain Coaster, LLC. (Hurt, Rachel)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Palvi Mohanty, Subash C Mohanty. Wiegand Sports, LLC served on 9/11/2019. (ABF)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Palvi Mohanty, Subash C Mohanty. Gatlinburg Mountain Coaster, LLC served on 9/12/2019. (Patterson, Weldon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Palvi Mohanty, Subash C Mohanty.(Patterson, Weldon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wiegand Sports, LLC.(Lawhorn, John)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/28/19. (JBR)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/28/19. (JBR)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/28/19. (JBR)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gatlinburg Mountain Coaster, LLC, Wiegand Sports, LLC. (JBR)
August 28, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Palvi and Subash Mohanty against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4060848.), filed by Palvi N Mohanty, Subash C Mohanty. (Attachments: #1 Other civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Gatlinburg Mtn. Coaster, #3 Summons Wiegand Sports)(Patterson, Weldon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohanty et al v. Wiegand Sports, LLC et al (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiegand Sports, LLC
Represented By: John M Lawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatlinburg Mountain Coasters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josef Wiegand GmbH & Co. KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiegand Sports GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatlinburg Mountain Coaster, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Park Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palvi N Mohanty
Represented By: Weldon E Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Subash C Mohanty
Represented By: Weldon E Patterson
Represented By: Grant E Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palvi Mohanty
Represented By: Weldon E Patterson
Represented By: Grant E Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?