Ohmer v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV1)
Plaintiff: MARK OHMER
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00355
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SSA Office of General Counsel, Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (BDG)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re IFP Service. (BDG)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/16/2019. (BDG)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Ohmer. (Attachments: #1 Other proposed order)(Martin, Charles)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint - SSA :Attachment should be filed separately. Please refile your motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis separately i.e. Civil Events, Motions and Related Filings, Motions, In Forma Pauperis (Proceed). requirements due by 9/16/2019. (BDG)
September 11, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BDG)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by MARK OHMER. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Other civil cover sheet, #3 Summons combined summons, #4 Other pauper proposed order)(Martin, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohmer v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK OHMER
Represented By: Charles Lee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?