Seymour v Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: John R. Seymour
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00357
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - US Attorney, #2 Summons Issued - US Attorney General)(JBR)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE re IFP Service. (JBR)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 10/21/19. (JBR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint - SSA : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, please file all Summons in a non-fillable format. (CAT)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint - SSA : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, please file the Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable format. (CAT)
September 12, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John R. Seymour. (Miller, Kenneth)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by John R. Seymour. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Commissioner, #3 Summons U.S.Atty., #4 Summons US Atty Knoxville)(Miller, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seymour v Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Seymour
Represented By: Kenneth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?