Sinard v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Sinard
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00358
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 27 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Order)(Ramsey, Shane)
November 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent form [Doc. 11-1] on or before November 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 10/21/19. (JBR) Modified to reflect copy mailed to CJ Cuneo on 10/21/2019 (JBR).
October 18, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Consent/Nonconsent to Magistrate Judge by Wanda Sinard. (AYB)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 10/17/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to CJ Cuneo on 10/21/2019 (JBR).
October 15, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #12 MOTION for Carolyn Cuneo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (AYB)
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing by Wanda Sinard the certificate of good standing for attorney Carolyn J Cuneo re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (The certificate is older than 30 days, but a check this date of the Colorado Supreme Court's web page notes Ms. Cuneo is in good standing.) (AYB)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 10/4/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
October 4, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dell P. Chappell and #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric A. Paine (AYB)
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric A. Paine ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4095771.) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Ramsey, Shane)
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dell P. Chappell ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4095752.) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Ramsey, Shane)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. (Ramsey, Shane)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 Administrative Notice to Counsel re: #16 - Please file a Notice to Withdraw pursuant to LR83.4 (f) Appearance and Withdrawal of Counsel, which reads: (f) Withdrawal Upon Notice to the Court. Where a party is represented by multiple counsel of record, an attorney may withdraw, provided the party is still being represented by another attorney of record, upon the filing of a notice of withdrawal. (AYB)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane G Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane)
September 20, 2019 A non-party individual called the Clerk's Office this morning to report mail received for Richard North c/o Nelson Mullins. The Clerk's Office reached out to Mr. North by email and was provided his updated firm address. Pdf.s of Documents 7 - 11 emailed to Mr. North. (AYB)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to #12 MOTION for Carolyn J. Cuneo to Appear Pro Hac Vice: A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. (AYB)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Carolyn J Cuneo to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 received: K3038817) by Wanda Sinard. (AYB)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/16/19. (copy mailed to counsel) (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent Form) (JBR)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/16/19. (copy mailed to counsel) (JBR)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/16/19. (copy mailed to counsel) (JBR)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/16/19. (copy mailed to counsel) (JBR)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Richard North, Jr. and CJ Cuneo: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (JBR) Modified to reflect copy emailed to counsel on 9/16/2019 (JBR).
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00791.
September 11, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Eastern District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/16/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #4 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/16/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/16/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Attorney Richard B North, Jr for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated added pursuant to Notice of Appearance filed 3/12/19 in Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC at (Doc. 15912). (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/16/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-791-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/16/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Wanda Sinard. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/16/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16508505 filed by Wanda Sinard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinard v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Sinard
Represented By: C J Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?