Long v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (PLR1)
Plaintiff: Heather M Long
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00363
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of CASE with prejudice as to all Defendants by Heather M Long (Lee, Alan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather M Long. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 9/20/2019. (Lee, Alan)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 18, 2019. (SAC)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 18, 2019. (SAC)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 18, 2019. (SAC)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (SAC)
September 18, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (SAC)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4081146.), filed by Heather M Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collection Letter, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather M Long
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?