Hamby v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: William D. Hamby, Jr.
Defendant: Ken Hutchinson, Tony Parker, Nichols, Michael Earles, Sgt. Jeffries and Kevin Peddicord
Case Number: 3:2019cv00370
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #8 Memorandum Opinion. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Memorandum Opinion, #2 Envelope) (AMP)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT re #8 Memorandum Opinion. For the reasons set forth in the memorandum opinion filed herewith, this pro se prisoner's complaint for relief filed under 42 U.S.C. 1983 is DISMISSED for want of prosecution pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Because the Court CERTIFIED in the memorandum opinion that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, should Plaintiff file a notice of appeal, he is DENIED leave to appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/13/2019. (Copy of Judgment mailed to William D. Hamby, Jr.) (AMP)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION: For the reasons set forth above, the Court concludes that the relevant factors weigh in favor of dismissal of Plaintiff's action pursuant to Rule 41(b). The Court CERTIFIES that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/13/2019. (Copy of Memorandum mailed to William D. Hamby, Jr.) (AMP)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary documents. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/07/2019. (Copy of Order, prison account statement form and motion for leave to proceed mailed to William D. Hamby, Jr.) (AMP)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (copy mailed to William B. Hamby at Morgan County Correctional Facility.) (KMK)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from the District of Delaware; Delaware District Court Case Number 1:19-cv-01568.
September 18, 2019 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/24/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2019. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/24/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2019. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/24/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/24/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/24/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Statement of Claim filed against Michael Earles, Ken Huntchinson, Jeffries, Nichols, Tony Parker, Kevin Peddicord - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by William Davidson Hamby, Jr. (No Fee Paid; No IFP)(kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamby v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Earles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Peddicord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D. Hamby, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?