Lee Mendelson Film Productions, Inc. v. The Dollywood Company
Plaintiff: Lee Mendelson Film Productions, Inc.
Defendant: The Dollywood Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00395
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 10/17/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lee Mendelson Film Productions, Inc.. The Dollywood Company waiver sent on 10/16/2019. (Busch, Richard)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to The Dollywood Company. (DJH)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/9/2019. (DJH)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/9/2019. (DJH)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/9/2019. (DJH)
October 9, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4099370.) filed by Lee Mendelson Film Productions, Inc. as to Lee Mendelson Film Productions, Inc. (DJH)
October 8, 2019 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (DJH)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lee Mendelson Film Productions, Inc.. (Busch, Richard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4099370.) by Lee Mendelson Film Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing)(Busch, Richard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Dollywood Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4099369.), filed by Lee Mendelson Film Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B- Report on The Filing or Determination of An Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright, #3 Summons C- Summons)(Busch, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee Mendelson Film Productions, Inc. v. The Dollywood Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Mendelson Film Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dollywood Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?