The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C. v. The Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration
Plaintiff: The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.
Defendant: The Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00403
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/12/2019. (AML)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT by The Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration (Anderson, M)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/25/2019. (KTC)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/25/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration.(Anderson, M)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C. Notice of Plaintiff's Waiver of Trial by Jury (Burkhalter, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.. (Burkhalter, David)
October 15, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C. (AML)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/15/2019. (AML)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/15/2019. (AML)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/15/2019. (AML)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Department of Energy c/o US Attorney J. Douglas Overby)(AML)
October 15, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AML)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4102635.), filed by The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Secretary of Energy, #3 Summons Summons US Attorney, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Burkhalter, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C. v. The Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.
Represented By: David A Burkhalter, II
Represented By: David Alexander Burkhalter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration
Represented By: M Kent Anderson
Represented By: Loretta S Harber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?