United States of America v. Davex Energy, LLC.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Davex Energy, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00405
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 30:0801
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Davex Energy, LLC. (JBR)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Request for Summons in a Civil Action (Saffles, Kenny)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/16/2019. (DJH)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/16/2019. (DJH)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/16/2019. (DJH)
October 16, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Davex Energy, LLC.. (DJH)
October 15, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (DJH)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Davex Energy, LLC on 10/15/2019 by United States of America. (Saffles, Kenny)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Davex Energy, LLC., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Collective A- Certificates of Indebtedness)(Saffles, Kenny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Davex Energy, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davex Energy, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kenny L Saffles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?