Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00420
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 12/5/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 12/5/2019 to indicate c/m to Nikki McArthur and Donald Munro (ABF).
December 5, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nikki L. McArthur ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4146554.) filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Co., #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Donald J. Munro ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4146544.) filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Co. (ABF)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Norfolk Southern Railway Co.. (Baker, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nikki L. McArthur ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4146554.) by Norfolk Southern Railway Co.. (Baker, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Donald J. Munro ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4146544.) by Norfolk Southern Railway Co.. (Baker, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Baker, Jr on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Co. (Baker, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT. Norfolk Southern Railway Co. waiver sent on 10/28/2019. (Barrett, Patrick)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/31/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 11/1/2019 to indicate c/m to Richard Edelman (ABF).
October 31, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4118766.) filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT (ABF)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4118766.) by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT. (Barrett, Patrick)
October 25, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Co. (ABF)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/25/19. (c/m to Richard S Edelman, Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch PC, 1920 L Street NW, Suite 400, Washington, DC 20036) (ABF)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/25/19. (c/m to Richard S Edelman, Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch PC, 1920 L Street NW, Suite 400, Washington, DC 20036) (ABF)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/25/19. (c/m to Richard S Edelman, Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch PC, 1920 L Street NW, Suite 400, Washington, DC 20036) (ABF)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Richard Edelman: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge ifa pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be foundhere: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (c/m to Richard S Edelman, Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch PC, 1920 L Street NW, Suite 400, Washington, DC 20036) (ABF)
October 25, 2019 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint civil cover sheet by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT. (Barrett, Patrick)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4112949.), filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT.(Barrett, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division/IBT
Represented By: Patrick M Barrett, III
Represented By: Richard S Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Represented By: Donald J Munro
Represented By: Nikki L McArthur
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Represented By: Emily L Herman-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?