iXsystems, Inc. v. Koshani et al (TWP2)
Plaintiff: iXsystems, Inc.
Defendant: Shafiqullah Koshani, Faye Langley, Fred R Langley, Eric Wayne Barton and Fred Langley
Case Number: 3:2019cv00444
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas W Phillips
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Eric Wayne Barton. (Hurley, D)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: the above-captioned case is related to Koshani v. Barton, et al., No. 3:17-CV-265. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas W. Phillips and Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Thomas W. Phillips and Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on December 2, 2019. (AYB)
December 2, 2019 District Judge Thomas W Phillips and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AYB)
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against Eric Wayne Barton, Faye Langley, Fred Langley by Shafiqullah Koshani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Finley, Tillman)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Shafiqullah Koshani. (GRE)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,, Summons to Shafiqullah Koshani by iXsystems, Inc.. (Dumitru, Michael)
November 6, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Shafiqullah Koshani. (GRE)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eric Wayne Barton, Faye Langley, Fred Langley. (GRE)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by iXsystems, Inc.. (Dumitru, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4124120.), filed by iXsystems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) Writ of Garnishment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) Notice of Assignment of Lease Payments, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) Deed of Trust, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Summons to Eric Wayne Barton, #7 Summons Summons to Faye Langley, #8 Summons Summons to Fred Langley)(Dumitru, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: iXsystems, Inc. v. Koshani et al (TWP2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shafiqullah Koshani
Represented By: Tillman James Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faye Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred R Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Wayne Barton
Represented By: D Scott Hurley
Represented By: Ryan Neil Shamblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iXsystems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Dumitru
Represented By: Jenna W Fullerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?